Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chavez, Irma R, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2001 |
CategoryGuardianship |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time113 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Order Terminating Guardianship TERMINATE GUARDIAN Notes: ORDER TERMINATING GUARDIANSHIP OF AZALEA MORENO |
|
March 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Petition PETITON TO TERMINATE IRMA CHAVEZ, GUARD, PRESENT W/SPANISH INTERP CASAREZ MELISSA MORENO, MOTHER PRESENT NO OPPOSITION BY GUARDIAN TO GRANT PETITION COURT GRANTED PETITION TO TERMINATE, ORDER EXECUTED Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
March 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
PETITION TO TERMINATE GUARDIAN PRESENT, MOTHER PRESENT COURT ORDERED MATTER CONTINUED TO HAVE SPANISH SPEAKING INTERP PRESENT CONTINUED TO/FOR: 3-18-05 8:30AM PET DEPT 11
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
March 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Investigative Report COURT INVESTIG RPT Notes: COURT INVESTIGATOR'S REPORT |
|
March 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: CALENDAR BASKET |
|
February 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF GUARDIANSHIP CONTINUED BY COURT PER JOHN LAURICELLA FOR REPORT
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
January 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Investigator ORD APPT CRT INVEST Notes: John Lauricella |
|
January 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING* Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 1/26/05 |
|
January 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Petition PETN* Notes: FOR TERMINATION OF GUARDIANSHIP (filed by Melissa Moreno) |
|
March 13, 2002 | Docket Event |
*Review REVIEW MATTER HEARD: COURT MAKES NO CHANGES TO PREVIOUS ORDER NO FURTHER REVIEWS ARE SET (tg) Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.