Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Prum, Saveth, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Speiller, Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSpeiller, Stacy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2020 |
CategoryCompromise Of Disputed Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order Approving Compromise
Date: January 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 | Hearing | Proof of Deposited Funds Hearing | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Petition Hearing: Disputed Claim Proof of Deposited Funds Hearing Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Approving Compromise | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Deposit | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Petition Hearing: Disputed Claim Petition Hearing: Disputed Claim Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem - Probate | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition to Approve Compromise or Disposition of Proceeds | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition For Appt Of Guardian Ad Litem-Probate Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.