Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bunthy Ho filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJacobson, Jack M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 13, 2020 |
CategoryGuardianship: Person/Relative |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2021 | Hearing | Court Trial | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Temporary Guardian | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Letters Issued | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Due Diligence | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing With Proof of Service: Guard/Cons | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Objection | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Child Abuse Central Index |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.