Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Young, Carolyn M, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 1998 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Other Hearing JUDGE TEW ATTY R. HOPPIN PRES PETITION GRANTED ACCT APPROVED, SETTLED AND ALLOWED Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
August 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Petition Granted PETN GRANTED |
|
August 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHELF |
|
August 04, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: INSTRUCTING TRUSTEE RE DISTRIBUTION AND APPROVAL OF ACCOUNTING AND FEES | |
July 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order ORD SETTLING* Notes: SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF CONSERVATOR;ORDER TERMINATING CONSERVATORSHIP DUE TO DEATH OF CONSERVATEE;ORDER ALLOWING CONSERVATOR'S AND ATTORNEY'S FEES;ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF ASSETS PURSUANT O PROBATE CODE SECTION 13100 ET SEQ, AND FOR DISCHARGE OF CON SERVATOR |
|
July 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting ACCOUNT & REPORT ON CONSERVATORSHIP R HOPPIN PRES PETN GRANTED ACCOUNT APPROVED. ORDER SIGNED BY COURT. Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
June 28, 2005 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT* Notes: FOR COLLECTION OR TRANSFER OF PERSONAL PROPERTY | |
June 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING* Notes: NOTICE IS GIVEN THAT SCOTT JOHNSTON, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE, HAS FIELD PETITION INSTRUCTING TRUSTEE RE DISTRIBUTION AND ACCOUNTING AND FEES (PROBATE CODE SECTION 17200(B), (4),(5),(6), (9) |
|
June 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Petition PETN* Notes: INSTRUCTING TRUSTEE RE DISTRIBUTION AND ACCOUNTING AND FEES (PROBATE CODE SECTION 17200(B),(4),(5),(6),(9( |
|
May 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING* Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUT AND REPORT; ATTY FEES; TERMINATION OF CONSERVATORSHIP DUE TO DEATH OF CONSERVATEE; DISTRIBUTION OF ASSETS; DISCHARGE OF CONSERVATOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.