Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Public Guardian filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Gaard, Janet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGaard, Janet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 1996 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION OF FINAL DISCHARGE |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
PROBATE MINUTE ORDER Conservatorship Review Accounting NINETEENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT & REPORT ON CONSERVATORSHIP Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order TERMINATION OF CONSERVATORSHIP, DEATH OF CONSERVATEE |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition Granted PETN GRANTED Notes: PET FOR DSCHRGE GRANTED |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: APPROVING NINETEENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT AND GRANTING DISCHARGE OF CONSERVATOR | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/21/18 AT 9AM IN DEPT.6 |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Accounting Report ACCOUNT & REPORT* Notes: NINETEENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF CONSERVATOR AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE OF CONSERVATOR |
|
November 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Trial Setting Conference TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDARED FOR WRONG DATE. SHOULD HAVE BEEN SET FOR 1/22/10. Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
November 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting ACCOUNT & REPORT ON CONSERVATORSHIP ATTYS B. BANDLEY, APD FOR CONSERVATEE; HOPE P. WELTON DEP. CO COU. FOR CONSERVATOR. CONSERVATOR WITHDRAWS PETITION. CONSERVATORSHIP IS TERMINATED. CONSERVATOR TO FILE FINAL ACCOUNT. Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Accounting Report ACCOUNT & REPORT* Notes: 9TH ACCT AND RPT OF CONSERV AND PETITION FOR REAPPT OF CONSERV |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.