Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Nina Wendt filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Speiller, Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSpeiller, Stacy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2019 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2021 | Hearing |
Final Accounting
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Accounting Review Hearing
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing With Proof of Service: Estates/Trusts | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | First and Final Accounting: Petition | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Accounting Review Hearing
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Inventory Review
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Inventory & Appraisal | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Personal Representative | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Will Admitted To Probate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.