Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 24, 1988 |
CategoryConservatorship Of Person & Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING-VERIFICATION OF TRANSFER Desc2: CONT FROM 1-9-14 Disp Code: 936 - OFF-CALENDAR, REQUIREMENTS MET Disp Clerk: BMK Filing Clerk: MKI Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING CLERK'S MEMO TO FILE DATED 4/10/14 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BMK |
|
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR DOCUMENTS PLACER CO CASE# SPR0007253 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BMK | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | CHANGE OF VENUE (RECORD PREP FOR TRANSFER) Fee Type: W1 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 50.00 Entry Clerk: BMK 453 - $50.00 | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING-VERIFICATION OF TRANSFER Notice Date: 2013-11-27 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT FOR FURTH HRG Disp Clerk: MKI Filing Clerk: MKI Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW TO VERIFY TRANSFER COMPLETE Disp Code: 948 - VACATED & RESET Disp Clerk: MKI Filing Clerk: MKI Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
November 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF RESCHEDULING VERIFICATION OF TRANSFER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MKI |
|
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING-ANNUAL Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CAL-PTN TO TRANSFER GRANTED 10/10/13 Disp Clerk: CLL Filing Clerk: BMK Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing Desc: PTN TO TRANSFER PROCEEDINGS TO PLACER CO Desc2: **VACATE REVIEW HEARING OF 11-14-13 Disp Code: 342 - CALLED/NO OBJ/ RULING OF 10/10/13 STANDS Disp Clerk: CLL Filing Clerk: MKI Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
October 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING RE TRANSFER Desc3: *CONT FROM 9/12/13 Disp Code: 220 - APPROVED Disp Clerk: MKI Filing Clerk: BMK Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.