Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Koon, Bruce, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Carl W. Morris presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarl W. Morris Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 09, 1997 |
CategoryGeneral Probate |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Inventory and Appraisal Final Filed
Date: 2007-12-07T00:00:00Petition for Final Distribution Filed by BRUCE KOON
Date: 2008-10-15T00:00:00Order Approving Final Distribution - Waiver of Accounting Filed
Date: December 19, 2008Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for BRUCE KOON
Date: October 21, 2008Waiver of Account Filed by BRUCE KOON
Date: 2008-04-04T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Terry Tang Filed
Date: April 03, 2009Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: December 19, 2008Declaration Of Attorney In Support Filed
Date: December 19, 2008Receipt on Distribution by Party Michael Tang Filed
Date: April 03, 2009Receipt on Distribution by Party Bruce Koon Filed
Date: April 03, 2009Examiner's Notes: Distribution ON 12/19/2008
Date: December 18, 2008Waiver by Executor of Compensation as Executor Filed
Date: 2008-04-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.