Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rask, Pamela, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Kennedy Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2017 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time416 days |
DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER RASK, PAMELA
Date: August 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2019 | Hearing |
ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Close Of Estate
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR STATUS ON CLOSE OF ESTATE, CALENDAR OF MAR-25-2019, OFF CALENDAR PER COURT | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION FOR GABRIELA RASK (TRANSACTION ID # 62724820) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE RASK, PAMELA | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 62670719) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE RASK, PAMELA | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION FEES FILED BY PETITIONER RASK, PAMELA | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (13 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE RASK, PAMELA | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
October 17, 2018 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF OCT-17-2018, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER AS MODIFIED. | |
October 03, 2018 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.