Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ramos Juan Luis, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Galindo Marcia, against Perez Sandy, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Michael W. Fitzgerald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael W. Fitzgerald Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions246 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time246 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ramos, Juan ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order (RE Change of Certificate for Live Birth - SUBMITTED - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ramos, Juan - Signed on 2011-07-11 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Brief (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ramos, Juan ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in San Fernando Dept. - L, Terrell, Michael, Presiding Short Cause Trial - Judgment - Granted Judge: Michael |
|
June 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order (RE OSC/Trial on 6-10-11 - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ramos, Juan - Signed on 2011-06-10 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ramos, Juan ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ramos, Juan - Filed and Entered on 2011-06-10 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Brief (RE Trial - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ramos, Juan ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ramos, Juan ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.