Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Eng, Elyse M., Thalheimer, Richard J. Po Box, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2013 |
CategoryPetition For Appointment Of Conservator Of Person |
Last RefreshedMarch 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time2038 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PAYMENT OF ASSESSMENT FEES FILED BY CONSERVATOR THALHEIMER, RICHARD J. | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ASSESSMENT AND ORDER FILED | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | REVIEW INVESTIGATION REPORT (CONFIDENTIAL) | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL FILED | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | STATUS REPORT (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY CONSERVATOR ENG, ELYSE M. THALHEIMER, RICHARD J. | |
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PAYMENT OF ASSESSMENT FEES FILED BY CONSERVATOR THALHEIMER, RICHARD J. | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | REVIEW INVESTIGATION REPORT (CONFIDENTIAL) | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | ASSESSMENT AND ORDER FILED | |
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event | STATUS REPORT (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER ENG, ELYSE M. | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (5 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY CONSERVATOR THALHEIMER, RICHARD J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.