Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Quall Matthew W., against Spore Mark S, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth Courthouse with Melvin D. Sandvig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelvin D. Sandvig Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2018 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions223 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseChatsworth Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Clerk |
Case Cycle Time223 days |
Declaration code of civil; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Affidavit of Military Status; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Declaration Plaintiff's Waiver of Attorneys' Fees; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Judgment Judgment; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Plaintiff); As to: MARK S SPORE (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Default entered as to MARK S SPORE; On the Complaint filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NA on
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Hearing; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Plaintiff); As to: MARK S SPORE (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Declaration Plaintiff's Waiver of Securty Interest; Filed by: MARK S SPORE (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Declaration Plaintiff's Waiver of Securty Interest; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Plaintiff)
Date: September 20, 2019Summons Filed by null
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiff's Waiver of Securty Interest) Filed by MARK S SPORE (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Plaintiff)
Date: November 03, 2021Declaration (Plaintiff's Waiver of Securty Interest) Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Affidavit (of Military Status) Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing) Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Judgment Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Declaration (code of civil) Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiff's Waiver of Attorneys' Fees) Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by null PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Declaration (code of civil)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Affidavit (of Military Status)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiff's Waiver of Attorneys' Fees)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiff's Waiver of Securty Interest)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiff's Waiver of Securty Interest)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.