Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sigue Corporation, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Diaz Manuel J., against Tienda Mexica La Esperanza Inc., Hernandez Manuel, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth Courthouse with Unknown Judicial Officer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUnknown Judicial Officer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management177 days |
Filing DateNovember 02, 2004 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions174 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseChatsworth Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time174 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department F50 Status Conference |
|
April 25, 2005 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal Filed by SIGUE CORPORATION (Plaintiff) |
|
April 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department F50 (Request for Dismissal; ENTERED) - |
|
March 29, 2005 | Hearing |
Notice Filed by SIGUE CORPORATION (Plaintiff) |
|
March 14, 2005 | Hearing |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
March 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department F50 Court Order (Court Order; Case is reassigned) - |
|
February 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department F49 (Order to Show Cause; Continued by Plaintiff) - |
|
January 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department F47 (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) - |
|
December 28, 2004 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Filed by Clerk |
|
November 02, 2004 | Hearing |
Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by null |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.