Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Langston, Lequitta, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against All Occupants, Ianziti, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Leonard D. Goldkind presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeonard D. Goldkind Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2006 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time465 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case File Destroyed DESTROYED CASE FILE PURSUANT TO G.C. 68152 & STANDING MINUTE ORDER NO. 92-2 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LXW |
|
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: OSC RE: DISMISSAL (LR 4.6) Notice Date: 2007-03-09 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 331 - DISMISSED IN COURT Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: AB Judge: Goldkind, Leonard D |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: OSC RE: DISMISSAL (LR 4.6) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: AB |
|
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NOTICE RE UNLAWFUL DETAINERS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: AB |
|
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint - Unlawful Detainer (5 Day Summons Issued) COMPLAINT FILED (PARADISE) UNLAWFUL DETAINER 5 DAY SUMMONS FILED-COPY ISSUED Fee Type: W1 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 195.00 Entry Clerk: AB 445 - $195.00 |
|
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver ORDER RE: WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS GRANTED TO PLNTF Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: AB |
|
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: AB | |
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Legacy Service Information Name: IANZITI, MARK PartyId: PC01232_2_200_2 Service Type: PER Summons Date: 2006-12-21 00:00:00.0000000 |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Personal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.