Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Other filed a(n) Judicial Council Coordinated Proceeding (General Jurisdiction) case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with William F. Highberger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam F. Highberger Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1970 |
CategoryJudicial Council Coordinated Proceeding (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial1309 days |
Last RefreshedJune 01, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions254 days |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2022 | Hearing | ||
June 06, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
June 01, 2022 | Hearing | Final Status Conference | |
June 01, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
May 23, 2022 | Hearing | Jury Trial | |
May 23, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
May 09, 2022 | Hearing | Final Status Conference | |
May 09, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
March 07, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
February 22, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.