Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Renteria, Yessica, Castro, Ester, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to J1 effective 04/13/2012. | |
June 14, 2006 | Docket Event | 06/14/2006: Order on Application for Waiver of Additional Court Fees and Costs filed by ESTER CASTRO GRANTED for INVESTIGATOR FEES in the amount of $600.00 | |
June 14, 2006 | Docket Event | 06/14/2006: Fee Waiver Expires: 12/14/06 for ESTER CASTRO | |
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event | 06/12/2006: Application for Waiver of Additional Court Fees and Costs filed by ESTER CASTRO for INVESTIGATOR FEES | |
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event | 04/10/2006: Case assigned to Courtroom 44 due to judicial reassignment | |
February 24, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/24/2006: APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN Hearing: GRANTED | |
February 24, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/24/2006: Letters of Guardianship issued to ESTER CASTRO, YESSICA RENTERIA as to the PERSON ONLY of the minor(s) DESTINY JOANNA RENTERIA. | |
February 24, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/24/2006: Order Appointing Guardian ( AS TO THE PERSON ONLY) filed. Person appointed: ESTER CASTRO, YESSICA RENTERIA. Bond: 0. Deposit: 0 | |
February 24, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/24/2006: Guardianship Appointment Date is 02/24/06 | |
February 16, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/16/2006: CONFIDENTIAL Report of Investigator LEANN LIDZ filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.