Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cahon Associates, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Wilson, James, Jernigan, Samantha, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 1995 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 1995 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED AS TO REAL PROPERTY | |
February 21, 1995 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED | |
February 17, 1995 | Docket Event | Entry of COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER JUDGMENT | |
February 17, 1995 | Docket Event | COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER JUDGMENT | |
January 31, 1995 | Docket Event | COURT TRIAL 02/17/1995 09:00:00 AM D-2 | |
January 25, 1995 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/ENTERED | |
January 25, 1995 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO SET FILED | |
January 23, 1995 | Docket Event | ORDER/APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES GRANTED | |
January 23, 1995 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED Filed For JERNIGAN, SAMANTHA | |
January 18, 1995 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED SUMMONS ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.