Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Adult Traffic case against Swanson, Connie M, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with McLean, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcLean, Sandra Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 1994 |
CategoryAdult Traffic |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Collections - Returned from Butte County Central Collections CASE RETURNED FROM CENTRAL COLLECTIONS CC; BCCC Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CGD |
|
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Other hearing Desc: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS Desc2: [D] ADD ON REQUEST Disp Code: 674 - DISMISSED Disp Clerk: CGD Filing Clerk: JPB Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information [D] ADD ON REQUEST Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JPB |
|
September 07, 1996 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information CONVERTED FROM CHICO COURT SYSTEM Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: XYZ |
|
May 23, 1995 | Docket Event |
Collections - Referred to GC Services REFERRED TO GCS /CONVERSION |
|
December 13, 1994 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.