Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ladizinsky Esther Madyan, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with Patrick T. Madden presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick T. Madden Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 15, 2018 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
|
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time45 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department S27 Unknown Event Type |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department S27 Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change (HEARING ON NAME CHANGE; Petition granted) - |
|
June 29, 2018 | Hearing |
Decree Filed by Clerk |
|
June 28, 2018 | Hearing |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk |
|
May 23, 2018 | Hearing |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
May 15, 2018 | Hearing |
OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by null |
|
May 15, 2018 | Hearing |
Petition for Change of Name Filed by null |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.