Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Arturo Trinidad, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Anselmo Rolando Castro, represented by Law Offices Of Ron W. Saxman, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with Randall Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandall Pacheco Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 26, 2014 |
CategoryCivil Harassment (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court-Petition Denied |
Case Cycle Time113 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2015 | Hearing |
Order After Hearing Filed by Respondent |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department SOS16, Randall Pacheco, Presiding Petn For Injunctn Prohib Harassmnt - TRO is denied. Judge: Randall Pacheco |
|
March 19, 2015 | Hearing |
Notice of Lodging (of Reporter's Transcript of the Deposition of Arturo Trinidad NOTE: Reporter's Transcript returned to Respondent's Atty after the 3/19/15 hearing.) Filed by Attorney for Respondent |
|
March 19, 2015 | Hearing |
Request for Judicial Notice (of Order After Hearing ) Filed by Attorney for Respondent |
|
March 19, 2015 | Hearing |
Request for Judicial Notice (of Certified Copy of Minute Order ) Filed by Attorney for Respondent |
|
March 19, 2015 | Hearing |
Notice of Lodging (of Reporter's Transcript of the Deposition of Arturo Trinidad taken on August 26, 2014 NOTE: Reporter's Transcript returned to Respondent's Atty after the 3/19/15 hearing.) Filed by Attorney for Respondent |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department SOS16, Lori R. Behar, Presiding Petn For Injunctn Prohib Harassmnt - Matter is Continued/TRO ffe Judge: Lori R. Behar |
|
December 10, 2014 | Hearing |
Proof of Service (Re: TRO ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.