Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Marsha Fortner, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Edelma D'Trinidad, represented by Iturrioz Martha V., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with Randall Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandall Pacheco Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2014 |
CategoryCivil Harassment (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court-Petition Denied |
Case Cycle Time116 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department SOS16, Randall Pacheco, Presiding Petn For Injunctn Prohib Harassmnt - TRO denied Judge: Randall Pacheco |
|
December 19, 2014 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Respondent |
|
November 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department SOS15, John Chemeiski, Presiding Petn For Injunctn Prohib Harassmnt - Denied Judge: John Chemeiski |
|
November 07, 2014 | Hearing |
Proof of Service (of Response by Mail ) Filed by Respondent |
|
November 07, 2014 | Hearing |
Response (to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders ) Filed by Respondent |
|
October 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.