Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mongini, Shirley, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Pro Per, against Hudson, Josalyn, Peppers, Marquis, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Time To Trial41 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions166 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1252 days |
Minute Order
Date: May 19, 2016Opposition to Claim of Exemption
Date: April 21, 2016Order
Date: May 19, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Determining Claim of Exemption Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Other Proof of Mailing |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Other Hearing - Post disposition Opposition to Claim of Exemption |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Opposition to Claim of Exemption | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Other Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption |
|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED BUTTE CK#976 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 754362 Fee Amount: 25.00 Entry Clerk: MMC 542 - $25.00 | |
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT FILED COSTS $60.00 INTEREST $1005.34 CREDIT $-0- Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.