Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Berman, David, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Time To Trial34 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions27 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment
Date: March 11, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied | |
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment | |
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination Desc: APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION OF JMT DEBTOR Desc2: AFTER RETURN OF BENCH WARRANT Desc3: DAVID BERMAN Disp Code: 383 - SWORN & EXCUSED FOR EXAMINATION Disp Clerk: PBP Filing Clerk: KLD Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination Desc: APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION OF JMT DEBTOR Desc2: AFTER RETURN OF BENCH WARRANT Desc3: DAVID BERMAN Disp Code: 344 - J/D SWORN; CASE RECALLED & CONT Disp Clerk: KLD Filing Clerk: KLD Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination Desc: APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION OF JMT DEBTOR Desc2: AFTER RETURN OF BENCH WARRANT ON Desc3: DAVID BERMAN CONT FORM 11/6/15 Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT FOR FURTH HRG Disp Clerk: KLD Filing Clerk: SWB Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Desc: RETURN ON BENCH WARRANT Desc2: DAVID BERMAN Desc3: **SPECIAL SET** Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 12/4/15 Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: CLL Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination Desc: APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION OF JMT DEBTOR Desc2: DAVID BERMAN Disp Code: 916 - FTA; B/W ORD; BAIL SET $1000.00 Disp Clerk: PBP Filing Clerk: KLD Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination Desc: APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION OF JMT DEBTOR Desc2: DAVID BERMAN Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT FOR FURTH HRG Disp Clerk: KLD Filing Clerk: BMK Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF OEX AS TO DAVID BERMAN Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: PBP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.