Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Szlak Nicole, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by ., against Lynberg & Watkins Courtney Hylton, The Board Of Trustees Of The California, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with Patrick T. Madden presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick T. Madden Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2018 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDeemed Complete (No Remand From Federal Court) |
Case Cycle Time35 days |
Document:Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by:
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Other - Order To Show Cause Hearing; Filed by:
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: CLERKCLK
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Notice of Removal to Federal Court Filed by: for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Patrick T. Madden 8:30 am | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Patrick T. Madden 8:30 am | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department S27 Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv. Patrick T. Madden 8:30 am | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department S27 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Case Ordered Reassigned Mark C. Kim 8:30 am | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department S27 Unknown Event Type |
|
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event Result:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv. Advanced to this date & Vacated | |
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Removed to Federal Court 35 Days | |
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event Result:Conference-Case Management Advanced to this date & Vacated |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.