Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Porsche Financial Services Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Tharpe & Howell Stacey A Miller, against Gilligan Ronald, Gilligan Sean, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with Patrick T. Madden presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick T. Madden Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 25, 2018 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time47 days |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: May 23, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: June 11, 2018Summons
Date: April 25, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 25, 2018Complaint
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: June 04, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.