Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mandarich Law Group Llp, Mandarich Law Group Llp Ryan Vos, against Does 1-10, Jennifer D. Zorrilla, Zorrilla Jennifer D., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with Ross Klein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoss Klein Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions69 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Clerk |
Case Cycle Time70 days |
Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Document:Writ issued Filed by: ATTORNEY FOR JUDGMENT CREDITOR
Date: April 24, 2018Document:Request for Dismissal-Partial Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: ATTORNEY FOR JUDGMENT CREDITOR
Date: April 16, 2018Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Document:Default Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Complaint Filed
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Writ issued
Date: April 24, 2018Order (ORDER RE ACCPETING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS )
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal-Partial
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (ACCRUED INTEREST - $244.74 )
Date: April 16, 2018Default Judgment (AGAINST JENNIFER ZORRILLA )
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Declaration (PLNTF ABSOLUTE DECLRE ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS )
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: April 16, 2018Default Entered
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.