Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
International City Bank N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Buchalter Nemer Fields & Younger, against Birkes Charley R., Currie Robert F. Iii, Equity Housing Fund Xx, Equity Housing Group, Equity Partners Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Glover Carol Ann, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with MARGARET HAY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMARGARET HAY Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2001 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time270 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2002 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
July 03, 2002 | Docket Event |
in Department B, MARGARET HAY, Presiding OSC-Failure to Proceed w/DefltJudg (ANDPROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION) - Order of Dismissal Judge: MARGARET HAY |
|
June 25, 2002 | Hearing |
Notice (TO THE COURT OF BANKRUPTCY STAY AS TO DEFENDANT, CHARLEY R. BIRKES [CRC RULE 225(d)] ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 25, 2002 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal-Partial (W/OUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT, LINDA M. SWENSON ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 07, 2002 | Hearing |
Default Entered (AS TO DEFENDANT, CHARLEY R. BIRKES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 14, 2002 | Hearing |
Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PERSONAL DELIVERY, PERSON SERVED, CHARLEY R. BIRKES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 03, 2002 | Docket Event |
in Department B, MARGARET HAY, Presiding Status Conference - Matter is continued Judge: MARGARET HAY |
|
April 03, 2002 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal-Partial (W/PREJ AS TO DEFT. ROBERT F. CURRIE, III, ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
February 27, 2002 | Hearing |
Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PERSONAL DELIVERY, PERSON SERVED, DAVE MARTIN, PARTNER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
February 27, 2002 | Hearing |
Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PERSONAL DELIVERY, PERSON SERVED, DAVE MARTIN, PARTNER/AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.