Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Civil case against Fredy Menjivar Aguilar, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 22, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2015 | Action | Notice: Completion | |
December 19, 2014 | Action | DOJ Reporting - Legacy | |
November 21, 2014 | Action | Proof | |
October 27, 2014 | Action | DD1: Abstract of Conviction Reported | |
October 27, 2014 | Action | DD1: Abstract of Conviction Reported | |
October 21, 2014 | Action | Waiver and Plea Form | |
October 21, 2014 | Action | Document: Other | |
October 21, 2014 | Action | Minute Order | |
October 14, 2014 | Action | OR Release | |
October 14, 2014 | Action | Complaint Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.