Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Thomas, Brennan Emmanuel, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Julia L. Scrogin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia L. Scrogin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 13, 2020 |
CategoryOther Mental Health (Mho) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time57 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Firearm Prohibition Pet for Relief Hearing
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Subpoena Documents Received | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Subpoena Issued | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Firearm Prohibition Pet for Relief Hearing
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Documents Received From | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Report | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | MH Firearms Prohibition Relief Petition 8103 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.