Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Archer, Jason, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Bridges, Shalett, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Pacione, Lisa M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePacione, Lisa M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Request for Order - Petitioner
Date: June 06, 2022Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: May 13, 2021Parties ordered to appear at Mediation Conference.
Date: May 23, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Appear arraignment on bench warrant(c/r) |
|
February 15, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Appear arraignment on bench warrant(c/r) |
|
January 24, 2024 | Hearing |
Proof of Personal Service WARRANT |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service WARRANT |
|
January 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice to Appear Civil Warrant Hearing Date: 2/15/24 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division:B Party Ordered to Appear: Shalett Bridges |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice to Appear Civil Warrant Hearing Date: 2/15/24 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division:B Party Ordered to Appear: Shalett Bridges |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service of Contempt Service date 10/25/23 |
|
December 11, 2023 | Hearing |
Proof of Personal Service of Contempt Service date 10/25/23 |
|
December 11, 2023 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Contempt (Petitioner)
Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Petitioner
Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.