Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Valdez, Norma M, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Sanchez, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Green, Kenneth R., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGreen, Kenneth R., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2021 | Hearing |
To ensure the public has access to court proceedings during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court will be audio live streaming all non-confidential matters. This alternative method for observing courtroom proceedings is strongly encouraged during this time for all non-parties to avoid attending court in-person where social distancing protocols and limited courtroom access applies. It is also available because Judicial Officers may have to limit, or impose other reasonable restrictions upon, public access to their courtrooms and adjacent hallways based on recommended social distancing requirements. Each judge retains the discretion and authority to refuse, limit or terminate audio live streaming of the proceedings, or portions thereof, pursuant to the factors and prohibitions articulated in California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, and in consideration of other statutory and constitutional provisions. By Court Order and California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, audio live streams may NOT be recorded, broadcasted or rebroadcasted without prior written permission from the Court. Witnesses who have been instructed not to discuss their testimony or court proceedings with others may not listen to the audio streaming of any portion of the trial. |
|
April 26, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence
Judge: Pacione, Lisa M. |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
To ensure the public has access to court proceedings during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court will be audio live streaming all non-confidential matters. This alternative method for observing courtroom proceedings is strongly encouraged during this time for all non-parties to avoid attending court in-person where social distancing protocols and limited courtroom access applies. It is also available because Judicial Officers may have to limit, or impose other reasonable restrictions upon, public access to their courtrooms and adjacent hallways based on recommended social distancing requirements. Each judge retains the discretion and authority to refuse, limit or terminate audio live streaming of the proceedings, or portions thereof, pursuant to the factors and prohibitions articulated in California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, and in consideration of other statutory and constitutional provisions. By Court Order and California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, audio live streams may NOT be recorded, broadcasted or rebroadcasted without prior written permission from the Court. Witnesses who have been instructed not to discuss their testimony or court proceedings with others may not listen to the audio streaming of any portion of the trial. |
|
April 14, 2021 | Hearing |
Proof of Personal Service DV-109-, DV-100, DV-120, DV-101, DV-109,DV-110, DV-116 |
|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service DV-109-, DV-100, DV-120, DV-101, DV-109,DV-110, DV-116 |
|
March 29, 2021 | Hearing |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining Order Judge: Pacione, Lisa M. |
|
March 29, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence
Judge: Pacione, Lisa M. |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining Order Judge: Pacione, Lisa M. |
|
March 17, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Personal Service | |
March 15, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.