Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Johnson, Julia S, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Johnson, Joshua Y, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Marquez, Raymonda B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarquez, Raymonda B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 05, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2021 | Hearing |
Family Centered Case Resolution CONTD 1/20/21 3/29/21 6/01/21 8/13/21 10/18/21 *STATUS OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT* Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Centered Case Resolution CONTD 1/20/21 3/29/21 6/01/21 8/13/21 10/18/21 *STATUS OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT* Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
October 18, 2021 | Hearing |
Family Centered Case Resolution CONTD 1/20/21 3/29/21 6/01/21 8/13/21 *STATUS OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT* Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Family Centered Case Resolution CONTD 1/20/21 3/29/21 6/01/21 8/13/21 *STATUS OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT* Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
August 13, 2021 | Hearing |
Family Centered Case Resolution CONTD 1/20/21 3/29/21 6/01/21 *STATUS OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT* Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Family Centered Case Resolution CONTD 1/20/21 3/29/21 6/01/21 *STATUS OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT* Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
July 29, 2021 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice STIPULATED JUDGMENT |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice STIPULATED JUDGMENT |
|
June 21, 2021 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice JUDGMENT |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.