Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Middlesex Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Sandoval, Katherine A, against Reynolds, Dylan T., in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with DeMeo, Bradford presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeMeo, Bradford Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
Category23: Limited Other Pi/Pd/Wd - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal continued from 8/25/22 OSC for default package Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause continued from 7.7.22 OSC for settled pleadings or default judgment Judge: Broderick, Patrick |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Opposition to OSC |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Opposition to Dismissal |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal continued from 4/7/22 OSC re service Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Attorney Related Document Notice of Change of Handling Attorney |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.