Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wendy Weststeyn, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Lyon Law Pc, against Alberto Leal, Jesus Leal, Nutrien Ag Solutions Inc, Nutrient Ag Solutions Inc, represented by Ogletree Deakins Nack Smoak & Stewart, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with RAQUEL A. MARQUEZ presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRAQUEL A. MARQUEZ Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 03, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Wrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: January 28, 2021Notice of Document Return.
Date: January 27, 2021Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(b))
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint of WENDY WESTSTEYN
Date: January 21, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: January 27, 2021Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: January 21, 2021Notice of taking Defendants Motion for summary judgment/summary adjudication off-calendar
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Objection(s) to Defendants' Separate Statement No. 25
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint of WENDY WESTSTEYN
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Response to Objections to Evidence in Opposition to MSJ on Complaint of WENDY WESTSTEYN
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Objection(s) to Evidence ISO Opposition to MSJ
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Response to Separate Statement of Disputed and Additional Material Facts on Complaint of WENDY WESTSTEYN
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Errata to Declaration of Wendy Weststeyn
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Reply Mmeorandum ISO MSJ on Complaint of WENDY WESTSTEYN
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Separate Statement of Disputed Facts in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Separate Statement of Material Facts: Disputed and Additional in Opposition to MSJ
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Objections to Evidence in Opposition to MSJ
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Opposition to MSJ and Supporting Docs
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Compendium of Evidence in Support of Opposition to MSJ
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS INC, JESUS LEAL.
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Separate statement of undisputed facts filed
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Declaration of Carmen Vega in Support of Motion filed
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Appendix of Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication filed.
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Declaration of Jesus Alberto Leal in Support of Motion filed
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Declaration of Tim Isle in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Declaration of Mazen I Khatib in Support of Motion filed
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling re: Motion to Compel Further Responses filed
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to/for Compel Deposition of Ken Nichols by WENDY WESTSTEYN
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel further responses by WENDY WESTSTEYN filed
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel Special Interrog by WENDY WESTSTEYN filed
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to MTN TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROG,SET ONE,SANCTIONS by WENDY WESTSTEYN filed
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Reply to Oppo to Motion to Compel Spec Rogs and Sanctions by WENDY WESTSTEYN filed
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to MTN TO COMPEL DOCUMENT REQUESTS,SET ONE,SANCTIONS by WENDY WESTSTEYN filed
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Notice of withdrawal of Motion to Compel Deposition of Ken Nichols by WENDY WESTSTEYN filed.
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Opposition to OSC Re Sanc for PLA Failure to Appear at Trial by WENDY WESTSTEYN filed
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re: Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Opposition to OS re Sanctions for Failure to Appear at TSC by WENDY WESTSTEYN filed
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Opposition to ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS by WENDY WESTSTEYN filed
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to/for Compel Deposition of Ken Nichols by WENDY WESTSTEYN
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: OSC re Failure to Appear at Trial Setting Conf.
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Declaration of Ken Nichols in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel filed
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS INC.
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses by NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS INC filed
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Separate Statement in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses Filed
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deposition by NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS INC filed
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses by NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS INC filed
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Motion on 06/15/20 at 8:30 in Department S303.
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00At-Issue Memorandum
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS INC.
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Motion to/for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Ken Nichols by NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS INC filed
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Declaration of Geoffrey C Lyon and John Henk in support of Motion to Compel filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Proposed Order re: MOTION TO COMPEL for hearing on 06/15/20 submitted by WENDY WESTSTEYN.
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Declaration of GEOFFREY C LYON filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Separate Statement of Disputed Material Facts
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Opposition to Order to Show Cause re Sanction for failure to app by WENDY WESTSTEYN filed
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Opposition to OSC re Sanctions for failure to Appear by WENDY WESTSTEYN filed
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Proposed Order re: Motion to Compel for hearing on 06/15/20 submitted by WENDY WESTSTEYN.
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Opposition to Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions by WENDY WESTSTEYN filed
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Motion to/for Compel Deposition of Ken Nichols by WENDY WESTSTEYN filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Separate Statement in support of Motion to Compel filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Southwest)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of WESTSTEYN and filed.
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92590.
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Southwest)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS INC
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Assignment to Department for All Purposes.
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by WENDY WESTSTEYN
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: OSC re Failure to Appear at CMC Hearing 12/30/19.
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.