Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kelly Nolan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bish Law, against Patricia Suzanne Sanchez, represented by Law Offices Of George Muhar, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 10, 2018 |
CategoryAuto-Over $25,000 (Southwest)&Nbsp; |
Time To Trial529 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 |
JURY TRIAL Vacated |
||
January 22, 2021 | TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE | ||
December 17, 2020 |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (NOTICED) Vacated |
||
May 22, 2020 |
JURY TRIAL Continued Not Heard |
||
April 30, 2020 |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (NOTICED) Vacated |
||
April 01, 2020 |
NUNC PRO TUNC HEARING Completed |
||
April 01, 2020 | NUNC PRO TUNC HEARING SET FOR 4/01/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. S302 | ||
April 01, 2020 |
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NUNC PRO TUNC PROCEEDINGS. Not Applicable |
||
March 30, 2020 |
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 3/27/20. Not Applicable |
||
March 30, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.