Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jeannel, Charles, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Felman, Edward L, against Vernon, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Gutstein, Michael L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGutstein, Michael L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management29 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time635 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2010 | Hearing | Case Destroyed Pursuant to Government Code Section | |
February 19, 2009 | Hearing |
4003 Order to Show Cause Hearing Entered. |
|
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
4003 Order to Show Cause Hearing Entered. |
|
February 03, 2009 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED TO: Plaintiff herein and Plaintiff's attorney of record, if any: You, and each of you, are ordered to appear before the court on 2/19/2009 at 1:30 in Department BM, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed, or other sanctions imposed for your failure to comply with the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation and more specifically: FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE 3.1385 WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME] Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED TO: Plaintiff herein and Plaintiff's attorney of record, if any: You, and each of you, are ordered to appear before the court on 2/19/2009 at 1:30 in Department BM, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed, or other sanctions imposed for your failure to comply with the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation and more specifically: FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE 3.1385 WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME] Judge of the Superior Court |
|
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED TO: Plaintiff herein and Plaintiff's attorney of record, if any: You, and each of you, are ordered to appear before the court on 2/19/2009 at 1:30 in Department BM, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed, or other sanctions imposed for your failure to comply with the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation and more specifically: FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE 3.1385 WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME] Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED TO: Plaintiff herein and Plaintiff's attorney of record, if any: You, and each of you, are ordered to appear before the court on 2/19/2009 at 1:30 in Department BM, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed, or other sanctions imposed for your failure to comply with the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation and more specifically: FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE 3.1385 WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME] Judge of the Superior Court |
|
January 29, 2009 | Hearing |
NP1430 Department: BM Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY OR ON BEHALF OF ANY PARTY. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1385 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE SET FOR 2/19/2009 AT 1:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT DIVISION B, MOJAVE UNLESS SOONER DISMISSED. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
January 29, 2009 | Hearing |
4156 Case Management Conference (N40u) New Calendar |
|
January 29, 2009 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference UD COMPLAINT FILED 12-31-08 NO POS Judge: Gutstein, Michael L |
|
January 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference UD COMPLAINT FILED 12-31-08 NO POS Judge: Gutstein, Michael L |
|
January 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
NP1430 Department: BM Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY OR ON BEHALF OF ANY PARTY. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1385 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE SET FOR 2/19/2009 AT 1:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT DIVISION B, MOJAVE UNLESS SOONER DISMISSED. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.