Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Unifund Ccr Partners, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Quall, Matthew W, against Bennett, Pamela S, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Woodward, Cory J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodward, Cory J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management179 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time242 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2006 | Hearing |
4153 Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
August 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
4153 Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
August 17, 2006 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
August 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
August 14, 2006 | Hearing | Case Management Statement | |
June 27, 2006 | Hearing |
NP1430 Department: AM Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: APPEARANCE TELEPHONICALLY BY COURTCALL BY MATTHEW W QUALL ESQ ON BEHALF OF UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY OR ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT. UPON MOTION OF COUNSEL FOR UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS (PL-1) CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 8/29/2006 AT 9:00 IN DIVISION B, MOJAVE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
June 27, 2006 | Hearing |
4156 Case Management Conference (N40u) New Calendar |
|
June 27, 2006 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Woodward, Cory J. |
|
June 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
NP1430 Department: AM Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: APPEARANCE TELEPHONICALLY BY COURTCALL BY MATTHEW W QUALL ESQ ON BEHALF OF UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY OR ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT. UPON MOTION OF COUNSEL FOR UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS (PL-1) CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 8/29/2006 AT 9:00 IN DIVISION B, MOJAVE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
June 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
4156 Case Management Conference (N40u) New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.