Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Toni Russin, filed a(n) Civil: Limited-Roseville case against Kim Mcelwee, John Mcelwee, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
CategoryCivil: Limited-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2021 | Motion Denied (434110) | ||
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Objection | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ Possession - Issued | |
April 30, 2021 | Heard: Taken Under Submission | ||
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
April 22, 2021 | Heard: Continued (Orders Made) (432120) | ||
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.