Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Services American General Financial, filed a(n) Civil: Limited-Roseville case against Kyle Buehler, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2010 |
CategoryCivil: Limited-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time323 days |
Acknowledgment Satisfaction of Judgment Full -
Date: August 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment Satisfaction of Judgment Full - | |
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment Satisfaction of Judgment Full | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Filed | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Issued | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum Costs | |
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ Possession - Issued | |
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ Possession - Issued | |
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ Possession - Issued | |
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ Possession - Issued | |
August 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.