Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Civil: Limited-Roseville case against Jennifer Hernandez, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2008 |
CategoryCivil: Limited-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2009 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
July 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Issued | |
July 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Memorandum Costs | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment Court Default | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 21, 2009 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
February 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Request Default | |
January 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof Service- Summons | |
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Document Other | |
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.