Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Placer Crediors Bureau, filed a(n) Civil: Limited-Roseville case against Jack Badolia, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2007 |
CategoryCivil: Limited-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment Satisfaction of Judgment Full | |
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Filed | |
July 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 19, 2007 | Petition Denied (435210) | ||
May 01, 2007 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Issued | |
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Memorandum Costs | |
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Judgment Clerk's Default | |
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Request Default | |
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.