Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Long Beach Acceptance Corp., filed a(n) Civil: Limited-Roseville case against Joshua Latendresse, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2003 |
CategoryCivil: Limited-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2006 | Docket Event | Memorandum Costs | |
May 08, 2006 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Issued | |
April 28, 2003 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
April 18, 2003 | Docket Event | Judgment Court Default | |
April 11, 2003 | Docket Event | Request Default | |
February 03, 2003 | Docket Event | Proof Service- Summons | |
February 03, 2003 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.