Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Forms, Llc, filed a(n) Civil: Limited-Roseville case against Pro Data Business Forms, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2002 |
CategoryCivil: Limited-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2004 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
November 04, 2003 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
November 04, 2003 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Issued | |
October 23, 2003 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Filed | |
October 20, 2003 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
October 16, 2003 | Docket Event | Judgment Court Default | |
September 29, 2003 | Heard: Continued (432110) | ||
September 08, 2003 | Heard: Continued (432110) | ||
August 04, 2003 | Heard: Trial Date Set | ||
August 01, 2003 | Docket Event | Attorney Substitution |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.