Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
U.S. Plastic Lumber, Lowe'S Hiw, Inc., Nancy Halcumb, filed a(n) Civil: Limited-Roseville case against U.S. Plastic Lumber, Lowe'S Hiw, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2003 |
CategoryCivil: Limited-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2003 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
November 18, 2003 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
November 18, 2003 | Docket Event | Stipulation Order | |
November 04, 2003 | Continued: Parties (Stipulation) | ||
October 23, 2003 | Motion Granted (434210) | ||
October 16, 2003 | Dropped From Calendar: Failure to | ||
September 15, 2003 | Continued by Court: Other | ||
September 15, 2003 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
August 25, 2003 | Heard: Trial Date Set | ||
August 04, 2003 | Docket Event | Order Arbitration Vacated |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.