Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ford Motor Credit Company, filed a(n) Civil: Limited-Roseville case against Kenneth Bishop, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2002 |
CategoryCivil: Limited-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Filed | |
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment Satisfaction of Judgment Full | |
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Issued | |
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Memorandum Costs | |
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Filed | |
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Filed | |
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Issued | |
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Memorandum Costs | |
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Filed | |
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.