Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Starwest Botanicals Inc., filed a(n) Civil: Limited-Roseville case against Soe Trading & Management, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2002 |
CategoryCivil: Limited-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2003 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment Satisfaction of Judgment Full | |
July 11, 2003 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Filed | |
June 09, 2003 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Issued | |
June 03, 2003 | Heard | ||
April 08, 2003 | Heard: Continued (432110) | ||
April 01, 2003 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
January 22, 2003 | Docket Event | Request Default | |
January 22, 2003 | Docket Event | Judgment Clerk's Default | |
December 26, 2002 | Docket Event | Proof Service- Summons | |
December 26, 2002 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.