Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Karidis Harry, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Iascone Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with Andrea C. Thompson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrea C. Thompson Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCivil Harassment (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Lack Of Prosecution |
Case Cycle Time84 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department NWL, Andrea C. Thompson, Presiding Hearing-Petition Prohibiting Haras - Dismissal-TRO lack of prosecutn Judge: Andrea C. Thompson |
|
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department NWL, Andrea C. Thompson, Presiding Hearing-Petition Prohibiting Haras - Continued-all orders remain ff&e Judge: Andrea C. Thompson |
|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department NWL, Andrea C. Thompson, Presiding Hearing-Petition Prohibiting Haras - Continued-all orders remain ff&e Judge: Andrea C. Thompson |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department NWL, Andrea C. Thompson, Presiding Hearing-Petition Prohibiting Haras - Continued-all orders remain ff&e Judge: Andrea C. Thompson |
|
December 31, 2014 | Hearing |
Notice-Hearing Filed by Court |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition-Injunctive Ord-Harrassmen | |
December 31, 2014 | Hearing |
Order-Restraining Filed by Court |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration-Exparte Req-Given |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.