Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ralphs Grocery Company, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Valenzuela Sara, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with Andrea C. Thompson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrea C. Thompson Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 09, 2013 |
CategoryOther Family Law (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court-Petition Granted |
Case Cycle Time-1297 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2017 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorney (Former Attorney:Troy Gould PC New Legal: Jacob M. Harper ) Filed by Former Attorney for Pltf/Petn |
|
September 30, 2013 | Hearing |
Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per |
|
September 27, 2013 | Hearing |
Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per |
|
September 25, 2013 | Hearing |
Order-Restraining Filed by Court |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department NWL, Andrea C. Thompson, Presiding Hearing-Petition Prohibiting Haras - Granted-Order signed & filed Judge: Andrea C. Thompson |
|
September 11, 2013 | Hearing |
Proof of Service (of TRO Reissuance by personal service on 9/6/13 ) Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per |
|
September 06, 2013 | Hearing |
Proof of Service (WV-250, proof of service response by mail, request to continue court hearing, notice of new hearing date - by personal service on 9/4/13 ) Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per |
|
September 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department NWL, Andrea C. Thompson, Presiding Hearing-Petition Prohibiting Haras - Continued-all orders remain ff&e Judge: Andrea C. Thompson |
|
September 04, 2013 | Hearing |
Notice (OF NEW HEARING DATE AND ORDER ON REISSUANCE ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff |
|
August 09, 2013 | Hearing |
Declaration Filed by Attorney-Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.