Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Palisades Collection. L.L.C., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Grant, James P, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Lodi Branch with CONVERSION presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 04, 2008 |
CategoryLimited Civil Other Collections |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseLodi Branch |
Case Cycle Time3953 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURN FILED RECORD SEALED Writ of Execution as to James P Grant returned and filed. Status: Returned Without Satisfaction. Judge: Alva, Jose L. |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURN FILED RECORD SEALED Writ of Execution returned Unserved as to James P Grant. Costs Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution issued as to James P Grant on 08/22/2018 to Los Angeles County.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
DECVLARATION OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration of Non-Military Service filed by Palisades Collection. L.L.C.. Declaration of Non-Military Service Judge: Alva, Jose L. |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Payment received by Palisades Collection. L.L.C. in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 327526.
Judge: Alva, Jose L. |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
MC012 MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED RECORD SEALED Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $2,606.83 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment. Judge: Alva, Jose L. |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution issued as to James P Grant on 01/06/2017 to San Joaquin County.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
MC012 MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED RECORD SEALED Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $298.78 filed by Palisades Collection. L.L.C.. Memorandum of Costs After Judgment. Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Payment received by Palisades Collection. L.L.C. in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 131689.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF NON MILITARY STATUS FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration of Non-Military Service filed by Palisades Collection. L.L.C.. Declaration of Non-Military Service Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.