Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Palisades Acquisitin V. Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Aguilar, Claudia, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Lodi Branch with CONVERSION presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 04, 2008 |
CategoryLimited Civil Other Collections |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseLodi Branch |
Case Cycle Time4069 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Association created between Zarco, Gloria and Palisades Acquisitin V. LLC.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned (unsatisfied) filed by Palisades Acquisitin V. LLC on 03/17/2011.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Association created between Zarco, Gloria and Palisades Acquisitin V. LLC.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Palisades Acquisitin V. LLC on 09/16/2010.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ issued to San Joaquin County
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Payment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 09/16/2010, transaction number and receipt number 149660.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned filed by Palisades Acquisitin V. LLC on 12/24/2008.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Status of Palisades Acquisitin V. LLC updated to Active/Represented.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ of execution (money judgment) issued to Sacramento County - $15.00
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.